+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Dotson
+ − Vote
March 29, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 21