+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1827 is now Act 976
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- ORDERED ENGROSSED
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Wallace
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor