+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1822 is now Act 1052
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Christiansen
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Christiansen
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
March 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor