+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1797 is now Act 673
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor