+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1775 is now Act 974
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Bentley
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor