+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1763 is now Act 706
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Roll Call on the Emergency Clause. Emergency Clause was adopted.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed to pass. Motion passed.
- Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Christiansen
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Christiansen
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Christiansen
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 9
April 12, 2021: Roll Call on the Emergency Clause. Emergency Clause was adopted.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor