+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1755 is now Act 668
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Jean
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8