+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1754 is now Act 1215
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Slinkard
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor