+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1750 is now Act 789
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
March 13, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 23
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor