+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Sullivan
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Sullivan
+ − Vote
March 20, 2015: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor