+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1747 is now Act 1213
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Received from the House.
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Re-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 22