+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1746 is now Act 970
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as Passed.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor