+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor