+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1729 is now Act 613
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8