+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1729 is now Act 1151
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor