+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1719 is now Act 623
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by L. Eads
Amendment H2
Sponsored by L. Fite
Amendment H1
Sponsored by L. Fite
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
March 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor