+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1718 is now Act 801
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lundstrum
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 5, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4