+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1716 is now Act 915
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Hammer
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
March 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor