+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1710 is now Act 1041
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- The vote by which HB1710 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Returned From the House as requested.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as requested.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate having failed to pass.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as Failed to Pass
- Read the third time and failed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor