+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1708 is now Act 849
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor