+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1706 is now Act 594
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor