+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1706 is now Act 1275
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by E. Cheatham
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor