+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1702 is now Act 1067
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed, as amended, Amendment #1.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended. Amendment #1.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: Senate S1 C. Tucker 4/15/2021 12:03:48 PM PDF
Sponsored by C. Tucker
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2021: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4