+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1702 is now Act 848
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as Passed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor