+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1701 is now Act 1174
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Summers
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 25, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor