+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1699 is now Act 517
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor