+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1695 is now Act 1345
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Rapert
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Catlett
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Catlett
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Catlett
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
April 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 30