+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
- Received from the House.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Hillman
+ − Vote
March 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor