+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1685 is now Act 667
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Cozart
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9