+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1664 is now Act 1036
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Crawford
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Crawford
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 20