+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1651 is now Act 1035
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
April 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10