+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1647 is now Act 549
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (3)
March 19, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
March 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor