+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1640 is now Act 576
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
March 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 31