+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1630 is now Act 963
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lundstrum
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor