+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1624 is now Act 1017
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by S. Flowers
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Meeks
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2015: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 19
March 25, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor