+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1618 is now Act 1272
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Received from the House.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Baine
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
March 25, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor