+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1607 is now Act 991
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by U. Lindsey
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Della Rosa
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
March 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 15, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 21
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor