+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1605 is now Act 716
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 1, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5