+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1603 is now Act 876
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 2, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor