+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1603 is now Act 401
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor