+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1599 is now Act 873
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
March 18, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor