+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1597 is now Act 566
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Boyd
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Boyd
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
March 17, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13