+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Clincher motion failed of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by C. Douglas
+ − Vote
March 17, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor