+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1590 is now Act 483
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- The vote by which HB 1590 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED.
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 12
March 7, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 8
February 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor