+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1573 is now Act 954
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by U. Lindsey
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 6, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor