+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1573 is now Act 757
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Cozart
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11