+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1558 is now Act 425
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor