+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1555 is now Act 840
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
+ − Amendment
Amendment Chamber: House H1 Jett 4/13/2021 5:56:14 PM PDF
Sponsored by Jett
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor