+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1548 is now Act 1083
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- The vote by which the emergency clause FAILED was EXPUNGED.
- Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
April 3, 2017: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
April 3, 2017: Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
March 31, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor