+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1547 is now Act 977
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Motion to Expunge the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed of adoption. Motion passed.
- Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment H4
Sponsored by Lundstrum
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Lundstrum
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Lundstrum
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lundstrum
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
April 21, 2021: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
April 14, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor